Search results
Results from the Go Local Guru Content Network
The 12th Delta Operations Squadron (12 DOS) is a United States Space Force unit assigned to Space Training and Readiness Command 's Space Delta 12. It leads the delta's headquarters staff and manages cross-functioning processes of squadrons across the delta. It is headquartered at Schriever Space Force Base, Colorado. [1][2]
Space Delta 10. Space Delta 10 (DEL 10) is a United States Space Force unit responsible for space doctrine and wargaming. It was established on 23 August 2021 following the establishment of the Space Training and Readiness Command, the field command to which it reports. It is temporarily headquartered at the United States Air Force Academy ...
Director of Operations. Maj Danielle Ryan. Superintendent. SMSgt Jen Rider. The 11th Delta Operations Squadron (11 DOS) is a United States Space Force unit. Assigned to Space Training and Readiness Command 's Space Delta 11, it is responsible for providing operations support to the delta. It was activated on 15 September 2021.
The 10th Delta Operations Squadron (10 DOS) is a United States Space Force unit assigned to Space Training and Readiness Command 's Space Delta 10. It provides operations support to the delta. Temporarily headquartered at the United States Air Force Academy, Colorado, it was activated on 30 September 2021 following a ceremonial activation of ...
Delta Global Staffing (DGS) was a temporary employment firm located in Atlanta, Georgia. Delta Global Staffing was a wholly owned subsidiary of Delta Air Lines, Inc., and a division of the internal company DAL Global Services. Delta Air Lines sold majority ownership of DAL Global Services to Argenbright Holdings on December 21, 2018. As part of ...
Kenneth Bowra: Served with Delta Force from 1983 to 1988. Former Commanding Officer of Army 5th Special Forces Group from 1991 to 1993. Served with MACVSOG during Vietnam War in 1971–1972. William G. Boykin: Retired Lieutenant General. Former Commander of Delta Force from 1992 to 1994, including service in Somalia during the Battle of ...
Peter Jan Schoomaker (born February 12, 1946) is a retired four-star general of the United States Army who served as the 35th Chief of Staff of the United States Army from June 11, 2003, to April 10, 2007. Schoomaker's appointment as Chief of Staff was unusual in that he was recalled and came out from retirement to assume the position. [1]
The 1st Delta Operations Squadron (1 DOS) is a United States Space Force unit responsible for providing operations support to Space Delta 1 by serving as its headquarters staff. It also has a detachment that runs the service's basic military training. [1] It was activated on 2 September 2021 and is located at Vandenberg Space Force Base ...