Search results
Results from the Go Local Guru Content Network
7-Eleven, Inc. 7-Eleven, Inc.[2] is a convenience store chain, headquartered in Irving, Texas. The chain was founded in 1927 as an ice house storefront in Dallas. It was named Tote'm Stores between 1928 and 1946.
John Philp Thompson Sr. (November 2, 1925 – January 28, 2003), was the eldest son of Joe C. Thompson Sr., the founder of the 7-Eleven chain of convenience stores.
CEO of 7-Eleven (2000–2005) CEO and chairman, Blockbuster (2007–2011) James W. Keyes (born March 17, 1955) is an American businessman who is the chairman of Wild Oats Marketing LLC. Previously, Keyes served as chief executive officer (CEO) of 7-Eleven and was the chairman and CEO of Blockbuster. [1]
7-Eleven logo details. With this new name came a new logo: a large red “7” with “Eleven” spelled out and running through the numeral (visually similar to Tote’m’s totem pole T, but 7 ...
Seven & i Holdings Co., Ltd. Seven & i Holdings Co., Ltd. (株式会社セブン&アイ・ホールディングス) is a Japanese diversified retail holdings company headquartered in Nibanchō, Chiyoda, Tokyo. On September 1, 2005, it was established as a result of the integration of three companies: Ito-Yokado, Seven-Eleven Japan, and Denny's ...
7-Eleven. The 7-Eleven Cycling Team, later the Motorola Cycling Team, was a professional cycling team founded in the U.S. in 1981 by Jim Ochowicz, a former U.S. Olympic cyclist. The team lasted 16 years, under the sponsorship of 7-Eleven through 1990 and then Motorola from 1990 through 1996. From 1989 to 1996 it rode on Eddy Merckx bikes.
Itō was the owner, founder and honorary chairman of the $30 billion (in sales) Ito-Yokado retailing group, the second largest retailing organization in the world, which includes more than 10,000 7-Elevens in Japan and the US. Itō built the company from a small apparel store in Tokyo, into a corporation with annual revenues of more than $28 ...
Toshifumi Suzuki (鈴木 敏文, Suzuki Toshifumi) is a former CEO and president of 7-Eleven. Taking over after the resignation of James W. Keyes, Suzuki had been the temporary successor to Keyes while the search for a replacement CEO and president continued. [1] Suzuki has been a businessman since the early 1970s, during which he brought the 7 ...